BILL NUMBER: ACR 160CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 147 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 10, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 24, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 2, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 24, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member V. Manuel Perez (Coauthor: Assembly Member Salas) (Coauthors: Senators Ducheny and Huff) APRIL 19, 2010 Relative to the Imperial Valley Pioneers Expressway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 160, V. Manuel Perez. Imperial Valley Pioneers Expressway. This measure would designate the portion of State Highway Route 111 between Interstate 8 and State Highway Route 78, in Imperial County, as the Imperial Valley Pioneers Expressway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, In 1849, advancements in engineering made it possible for water to be conveyed from the Colorado River to the interior desert of Southern California, creating the opportunity for year-round farming; and WHEREAS, By 1901, courageous pioneers from throughout the world, staking their future on the region's agricultural promise, began to relocate to the vast desert area now called the Imperial Valley; and WHEREAS, These pioneers reflected the cultural melting pot of the early twentieth century, a patchwork quilt of peoples -- including African American, Chinese, East Indian, Filipino, French, German, Greek, Irish, Italian, Japanese American, Lebanese, Mexican, Portuguese, and Swiss -- that has contributed to California's rich diversity today; and WHEREAS, These pioneers envisioned the potential for prosperous and thriving communities in the harsh environment of the low desert, leveling their own land and constructing the first roads and canals, making way for the development of homes, schools, businesses, and places of worship; and WHEREAS, The determination, ingenuity, and hard work of the Imperial Valley pioneers helped to create a thriving $1 billion annual agricultural economy, making it one of the most productive farming regions in California; and WHEREAS, Imperial Valley pioneers became leading members of the community, helping to establish civic, religious, charitable, and other organizations to advance quality of life in the region; and WHEREAS, The Imperial Valley Pioneers Association was established in 1928 for the purpose of uniting pioneer families in the area and educating newcomers about the history of the early settlers to keep history alive for future generations; and WHEREAS, The Pioneers Museum and Cultural Center, located at Pioneers Park near the City of Imperial, is operated by the Imperial County Historical Society and is a rich archive of documents, newspapers, personal letters, period furniture, photographs, clothing, and sundry equipment used by early settlers, with galleries honoring the different ethnic communities and their history of settlement in the Imperial Valley; and WHEREAS, It is valuable and important to commemorate the remarkable modern history of the irrigated desert and of the people who settled it, to learn from the inspiring American story of diverse people uniting around the common dream of a better future, and to honor the vision and daring of those who opened the rugged desert frontier and built a community enjoyed by succeeding generations; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the significant contributions made by Imperial Valley pioneers to the State of California and designates the portion of State Highway Route 111 between Interstate 8 and State Highway Route 78, in Imperial County, as the Imperial Valley Pioneers Expressway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.