|
07/13/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2386.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1521.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1238.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|