California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR24 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/13/2009

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 24CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 66 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 13, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 29, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 6, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 26, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Carter FEBRUARY 11, 2009 Relative to the John Knabenbauer Fifth Street Bridge. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 24, Carter. John Knabenbauer Fifth Street Bridge. This measure would designate a specified bridge that crosses Interstate 215 in San Bernardino as the John Knabenbauer Fifth Street Bridge. This measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering those costs, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, The California Department of Transportation (Caltrans) is saddened by the tragic death of John Knabenbauer, a dedicated maintenance employee of the Department, who succumbed to injuries he suffered on November 28, 2007, when he was struck by a passing vehicle while working on Interstate 215, near the Fifth Street off-ramp, in San Bernardino; and WHEREAS, John Knabenbauer is survived by his wife Jeannette, his daughter Alyssa, his father Robert, and his sister Cindy; and WHEREAS, John Knabenbauer was born on October 19, 1965, grew up in the foothills of San Bernardino, and graduated from Cajon High School; and WHEREAS, A 17-year veteran of Caltrans, John embarked upon his state service career in May 1990 in the Landscape Division of Caltrans District 7 (Los Angeles) as a maintenance worker, and he transitioned to Highway Maintenance in July 1992, where he remained until September 1995, when he transferred to District 8 (San Bernardino/Riverside) in Riverside; and WHEREAS, John was promoted to Caltrans Equipment Operator II in Riverside on November 1, 2000, and transferred to the Fontana Maintenance Yard on July 16, 2005; and WHEREAS, Throughout his state service career, John was genuinely respected, admired, and appreciated by all who had the opportunity to know and work with him and to reap the benefits of his exceptional spirit; and WHEREAS, John received a commendation from President George W. Bush for his work in 2003 during the "Old Fire" in San Bernardino, where he helped maintain traffic control at the bottom of the hill and used a plow truck to maintain an evacuation route; and WHEREAS, In recognition of the contributions made by John Knabenbauer to Caltrans Districts 7 and 8, it would be a fitting tribute to designate the reconstructed Fifth Street Bridge in San Bernardino as the John Knabenbauer Fifth Street Bridge; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the Fifth Street Bridge that crosses Interstate 215 in San Bernardino as the John Knabenbauer Fifth Street Bridge; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.