05/26/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2009. | |||
05/26/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
05/21/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
05/21/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 978.) | |||
05/11/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/11/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1363.) | |||
04/30/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (April 30). | |||
02/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
02/19/2009 | From printer. | |||
02/18/2009 | Introduced. To print. |