California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR27 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/26/2009

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 27CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 34 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 26, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 21, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 11, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Davis (Coauthors: Assembly Members Blumenfield, Charles Calderon, De Leon, Gaines, Krekorian, Price, Silva, and Audra Strickland) FEBRUARY 18, 2009 Relative to World Languages and Cultures Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 27, Davis. Language education: World Languages and Cultures Month. This measure would declare the month of May 2009 as World Languages and Cultures Month. WHEREAS, On January 7, 2009, the State Board of Education approved the content standards for teaching foreign languages in kindergarten and grades 1 to 12, inclusive, which will strengthen the teaching of languages and cultures to pupils in California; and WHEREAS, California language organizations are participating in a 10-year Discover Languages, Discover the World! campaign sponsored by the American Council on the Teaching of Foreign Languages to increase public awareness in the United States of the importance of providing educational instruction in languages and cultures; and WHEREAS, Proficiency in more than one language enhances communication and strengthens positive interactions among people in the United States and around the world; and WHEREAS, The study of languages improves the academic and literacy skills of pupils, leading to increased levels of achievement on verbal and quantitative examinations; and WHEREAS, The study of languages and cultures provides insight into the history, heritage, and perspectives of all California residents and of residents of other communities around the world; and WHEREAS, The conditions of the current international economy require that Californians be able to interact effectively with persons from different cultural backgrounds; and WHEREAS, Linguistic and cultural competence is critical to the security needs of the United States; and WHEREAS, The study of languages and cultures increases understanding of, and encourages respect for, people of different backgrounds; and WHEREAS, During the month of May 2009 the California Language Teachers' Association, the California Foreign Language Project, the University of California Consortium for Language Learning and Teaching, and other educational organizations throughout California will sponsor special activities to promote awareness of the importance of California residents being able to interact successfully in multilingual and multicultural contexts in the United States and around the world; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of May 2009 as World Languages and Cultures Month, during which time the Legislature encourages all educational communities in California to celebrate languages and cultures with appropriate pupil activities and programs that promote an understanding of the diversity of languages and cultures in California and the benefit that they represent to our nation, and urges all residents to become interested in and give full support to quality language and cultural programs for all pupils in California schools; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.