09/16/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/16/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |||
09/08/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/03/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2173.) | |||
04/16/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
03/31/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/26/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 675.) | |||
03/09/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 9). | |||
03/02/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
02/26/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. (Corrected March 25.) | |||
02/05/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
12/02/2008 | From printer. | |||
12/01/2008 | Introduced. To print. |