LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR3
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR3
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR3
Compare Versions
ACR3 Chaptered September 16, 2009
ACR3 Enrolled September 10, 2009
ACR3 Amended March 26, 2009
ACR3 Amended February 26, 2009
ACR3 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
ACR3 Chaptered September 16, 2009
ACR3 Enrolled September 10, 2009
ACR3 Amended March 26, 2009
ACR3 Amended February 26, 2009
ACR3 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare