05/28/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2009. | |||
05/28/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | |||
05/26/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
05/26/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1004.) | |||
05/21/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
04/15/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/13/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 822.) Action rescinded whereby the resolution was adopted and to Senate. Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 823.) (Corrected April 21.) | |||
04/02/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 2). | |||
04/01/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
03/31/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |||
03/12/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
02/27/2009 | From printer. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. To print. |