California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR37 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/28/2009

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 37CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 35 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 28, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 26, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 31, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torres (Coauthors: Assembly Members Beall, Bill Berryhill, Tom Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Chesbro, De Leon, Eng, Fuentes, Furutani, Hill, Huffman, Jeffries, Lieu, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Monning, Nielsen, V. Manuel Perez, Portantino, Saldana, Solorio, Tran, Adams, Ammiano, Anderson, Arambula, Bass, Blakeslee, Brownley, Buchanan, Caballero, Charles Calderon, Carter, Conway, Cook, Coto, Davis, De La Torre, DeVore, Duvall, Emmerson, Evans, Feuer, Fletcher, Fong, Fuller, Gaines, Galgiani, Garrick, Gilmore, Hagman, Hall, Hayashi, Hernandez, Huber, Jones, Knight, Krekorian, Logue, Mendoza, Miller, Nava, Nestande, Niello, John A. Perez, Price, Ruskin, Salas, Silva, Skinner, Smyth, Audra Strickland, Swanson, Torlakson, Torrico, Villines, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 26, 2009 Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 37, Torres. California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. This measure memorializes the week beginning April 12, 2009, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. WHEREAS, Over one-half million dedicated men and women are engaged in the operation of emergency response systems for federal, state, and local governmental entities throughout the United States; and WHEREAS, An estimated 55,000 dedicated men and women are engaged in answering 911 calls and operating the emergency response systems in California; and WHEREAS, These individuals are responsible for responding to the telephone calls of the general public for police, fire, and emergency medical assistance, and for dispatching this critical assistance necessary to help save the lives and property of our citizens; and WHEREAS, Emergency calls include not only police, fire, and emergency medical service calls, but those of governmental communications related to forestry and conservation operations, highway safety and maintenance activities, and all of the other operations which an effective governmental agency must conduct; and WHEREAS, Public safety telecommunicators are the first point of contact for most interactions between members of the public and the public safety systems that keep Californians safe, and the public expects and receives extraordinarily dedicated service from these individuals; and WHEREAS, America's public safety telecommunicators serve the public in countless ways each day, often without recognition by the beneficiaries of their services; and WHEREAS, Congress has designated the week of April 12 to April 18, 2009, as National Public Safety Telecommunicators Week; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the week beginning April 12, 2009, is designated as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week, and the Governor is requested to issue a proclamation calling on the people of the State of California to observe the week with appropriate ceremonies and activities; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.