04/21/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 17, Statutes of 2009. | |||
04/21/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
04/16/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
04/16/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 520.) | |||
04/02/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/02/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 759.) | |||
03/31/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (March 31). | |||
03/12/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |