California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR41 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 04/21/2009

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 41CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 17 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 21, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 16, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Miller FEBRUARY 27, 2009 Relative to California Indian Heritage Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 41, Miller. Native Americans: California Indian Heritage Month. This measure would proclaim November 2009 as California Indian Heritage Month, encourage its observance with activities that celebrate our uniqueness as Americans, and commend California Indian nations for their outstanding contributions to this state. WHEREAS, President George W. Bush proclaimed November 2007 as National American Indian Heritage Month in recognition of American Indians and Alaskan Natives; and WHEREAS, California is home to more Native American Indian tribes than any other state in the United States; as of the last census, over 423,000 American Indians were living in the state in 2007, and their history forms an integral part of the state's history that needs to be told; and WHEREAS, In recognition of the sovereignty of the California Indian nations to be self-governing, self-supporting, and self-reliant, Californians are working to protect and enhance tribal resources; and WHEREAS, California Indians, through their rich cultural traditions and proud ancestry, have made vital contributions to the strength and diversity of our society; and WHEREAS, Native American Indians have given much to the United States and to California and, in recognition of this fact, it is fitting that the honor is returned by recognizing Native American Indians for their rich history and commitment to the State of California; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims that the month of November 2009 be recognized as California Indian Heritage Month, encourages the observance of this event with activities that celebrate our uniqueness as Americans, and takes this opportunity to commend California Indian nations for their outstanding contributions to this great state; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.