04/01/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2009. | |||
04/01/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | |||
03/26/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
03/26/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 351.) | |||
03/24/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/23/2009 | Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a final roll call vote was taken. Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 625.) (Corrected March 25.) | |||
03/17/2009 | Amended. To third reading. (Corrected March 23.) | |||
03/16/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) . | |||
03/12/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |