California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR44 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 04/01/2009

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 44CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 12 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 1, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE MARCH 26, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 23, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 23, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 12, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fuentes (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Arambula, Bass, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Brownley, Buchanan, Caballero, Charles Calderon, Carter, Coto, De La Torre, De Leon, Eng, Evans, Feuer, Fong, Furutani, Gilmore, Hall, Hernandez, Hill, Huffman, Jones, Krekorian, Lieu, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Mendoza, Monning, Nava, Nielsen, John A. Perez, V. Manuel Perez, Portantino, Ruskin, Salas, Saldana, Skinner, Solorio, Audra Strickland, Swanson, Torlakson, Torres, Torrico, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 27, 2009 Relative to the federal decennial census. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 44, Fuentes. Federal decennial census. This measure would declare April 1, 2009, to be California Census Awareness Day to promote awareness of the upcoming federal decennial census in order to advance the goal of a complete and accurate count of all Californians. WHEREAS, The United States Constitution requires an enumeration of the population every 10 years known as the United States decennial census; and WHEREAS, The next federal decennial census will occur on April 1, 2010; and WHEREAS, A complete and accurate count of Californians is critical to our state because census figures affect federal congressional representation, state redistricting, federal formula grant allocations, an estimated and state funding to local governments and local programs for the next 10 years; and WHEREAS, A high undercount in the upcoming census could cost the state a seat in the House of Representatives for the first time in history; and WHEREAS, California benefits substantially from federal programs tied to census figures, and an undercount of the state's population would severely impact funding for health, human services, education, and other programs; and WHEREAS, Despite outreach efforts in connection with the 2000 census, 522,796 Californians were not counted, resulting in a loss of $1.5 billion in federal funding for the state; and WHEREAS, Future outreach efforts depend on strong partnerships with state, local, and tribal governments, community-based organizations, faith-based groups, schools, businesses, the media, and others; and WHEREAS, Sufficient time is necessary to raise awareness, promote education, and extend outreach strategies to complement the United States Census Bureau's regional efforts; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares April 1, 2009, to be California Census Awareness Day to promote awareness of the upcoming federal decennial census in order to advance the goal of a complete and accurate count of all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.