03/19/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2009. | |||
03/19/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
03/16/2009 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 578.) | |||
03/12/2009 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
03/12/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 286.) | |||
03/10/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/03/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/02/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 488.) | |||
02/23/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 23). | |||
02/05/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
12/04/2008 | From printer. | |||
12/03/2008 | Introduced. To print. |