California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR5 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 03/19/2009

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 5CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 5 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 19, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE MARCH 12, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 16, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 10, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torlakson (Coauthors: Assembly Members Adams, Ammiano, Anderson, Arambula, Bass, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Tom Berryhill, Blakeslee, Block, Blumenfield, Brownley, Buchanan, Caballero, Charles Calderon, Carter, Conway, Cook, Coto, De La Torre, De Leon, DeVore, Duvall, Emmerson, Eng, Evans, Feuer, Fong, Fuentes, Fuller, Furutani, Gaines, Galgiani, Garrick, Hagman, Hall, Harkey, Hayashi, Hernandez, Hill, Huber, Huffman, Jeffries, Jones, Knight, Krekorian, Lieu, Logue, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Miller, Monning, Nava, Nestande, Niello, Nielsen, John A. Perez, V. Manuel Perez, Portantino, Price, Ruskin, Salas, Saldana, Silva, Skinner, Smyth, Solorio, Audra Strickland, Swanson, Tran, Villines, and Yamada) (Coauthors: Senators Ducheny and Wyland) DECEMBER 3, 2008 Relative to California Science Education Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 5, Torlakson. California Science Education Month. This measure would proclaim the month of March 2009 as California Science Education Month, and would extend the Legislature's support to students of all ages who are interested in science. WHEREAS, California is an intellectual center for advances in science through academic and industrial research, and California is also a leader in the computer and information sciences, life sciences, physical sciences, natural sciences, military sciences, environmental sciences, and agriculture sciences, having originated great innovation and progress in each of these fields; and WHEREAS, The cycle of innovation in the sciences has brought great benefits to the State of California, including improvements to the physical health and living standards of Californians and the world at large, and improvements to the intellectual and economic health of the state; and WHEREAS, California has become a world leader in scientific discovery in the disciplines of computer and information technology, clean technology, nanotechnology, medicine, biotechnology, and environmental science; and WHEREAS, New jobs in California are growing most rapidly in areas that require strong foundations in science, engineering, and technology, and eight of the 10 fastest growing occupations in the United States are related to science, mathematics, or technology, with an expected increase of 2.2 million science- and engineering-related jobs by 2010; and WHEREAS, California is experiencing a critical shortage of skilled American workers in scientific industries that is threatening our state's ability to compete in the global marketplace; and WHEREAS, The state is now focused on ushering in the next generation of great scientific leaders by encouraging its youth to engage in this noble pursuit; and WHEREAS, California needs to cultivate the scientific talents of all of its students, particularly those from groups that are underrepresented in science and technology, including women, minorities, and persons with disabilities; and WHEREAS, Given the growing threat to America's preeminence in science and technology, celebrations of science and of science education, such as the San Diego Science Festival and the Sally Ride Science Festival, and innovations in science classrooms across California are critical to raising student and public awareness of the dramatic impact science has on our lives, and to inspiring the next generation of scientific leaders; and WHEREAS, The health and economic benefits provided to our state by the businesses and institutions involved in the full range of scientific industries are numerous; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the month of March 2009 as California Science Education Month, and extends its support to students of all ages who are interested in science; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.