09/16/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/16/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |||
09/02/2009 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 2931.) | |||
09/01/2009 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
08/31/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 2010.) | |||
07/15/2009 | Read second time, amended, and to third reading. | |||
07/14/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 8). | |||
06/25/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/13/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/11/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 1344.) | |||
04/16/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 15). | |||
04/02/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/23/2009 | Introduced. To print. |