LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR54
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR54
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR54
Compare Versions
ACR54 Chaptered September 16, 2009
ACR54 Enrolled September 8, 2009
ACR54 Amended July 15, 2009
ACR54 Amended May 11, 2009
ACR54 Introduced March 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
ACR54 Chaptered September 16, 2009
ACR54 Enrolled September 8, 2009
ACR54 Amended July 15, 2009
ACR54 Amended May 11, 2009
ACR54 Introduced March 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare