09/16/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/16/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |||
09/02/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/01/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 2062.) | |||
06/11/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
05/27/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/26/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1675.) | |||
05/18/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |||
05/14/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
05/13/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |||
05/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
05/01/2009 | From printer. | |||
04/30/2009 | Introduced. To print. |