California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR68 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/16/2009

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 68CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 100 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 16, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 26, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 26, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 13, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Davis (Coauthors: Assembly Members Adams, Ammiano, Anderson, Arambula, Bass, Beall, Tom Berryhill, Blakeslee, Block, Blumenfield, Brownley, Buchanan, Caballero, Charles Calderon, Carter, Chesbro, Conway, Coto, De La Torre, De Leon, DeVore, Duvall, Emmerson, Eng, Evans, Feuer, Fletcher, Fong, Fuentes, Fuller, Furutani, Gaines, Galgiani, Garrick, Gilmore, Hagman, Hall, Hayashi, Hill, Huber, Huffman, Jeffries, Jones, Krekorian, Lieu, Logue, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Mendoza, Miller, Monning, Nava, Nestande, Niello, Nielsen, John A. Perez, V. Manuel Perez, Portantino, Ruskin, Salas, Saldana, Silva, Skinner, Solorio, Audra Strickland, Swanson, Torlakson, Torres, Torrico, Tran, and Yamada) APRIL 30, 2009 Relative to Public Service Recognition Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 68, Davis. Public Service Recognition Month. This measure would designate the month of May 2009 as Public Service Recognition Month, and encourage all Californians to recognize the crucial role of public employees in this state. WHEREAS, The contributions made by public employees in this state have strengthened our belief that public service is a noble profession; and WHEREAS, The professionalism and expertise demonstrated by public employees in this state in carrying out a wide variety of services have helped build a strong foundation for our government; and WHEREAS, Public employees have served the people of California well, even in difficult times; and WHEREAS, The State of California wishes to pay tribute to all public employees in the state for dedicating themselves to improving the quality of life for all of the people of California; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares the month of May 2009 as Public Service Recognition Month, and encourages all Californians to recognize the crucial role of public employees in this state; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.