09/16/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/16/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |||
09/08/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/04/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2207.) | |||
09/01/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
07/13/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
07/09/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2434.) | |||
07/01/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 30). | |||
06/08/2009 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
06/04/2009 | From printer. | |||
06/03/2009 | Introduced. To print. |