California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR80 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/16/2009

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 80CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 101 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 16, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hill (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Arambula, Bass, Beall, Tom Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Brownley, Buchanan, Caballero, Carter, Chesbro, Coto, Davis, De Leon, Eng, Feuer, Fuentes, Furutani, Huber, Huffman, Jones, Lieu, Ma, Mendoza, Monning, Nava, John A. Perez, V. Manuel Perez, Portantino, Ruskin, Salas, Saldana, Skinner, Swanson, Torlakson, Torres, Torrico, and Yamada) JUNE 3, 2009 Relative to a Bill of Rights for the Children and Youth of California. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 80, Hill. Bill of Rights for the Children and Youth of California. This measure would declare the Legislature's support for a Bill of Rights for the Children and Youth of California that resolves to invest in all children and youth so that certain goals may be achieved. WHEREAS, The Peninsula Partnership Leadership Council, which is made up of leaders from multiple disciplines throughout San Mateo County, has a mission to formulate policies that effectively address the needs and foster the healthy development of children, youth, and families; and WHEREAS, The Peninsula Partnership Leadership Council believes that all children and youth have rights to live in a just, moral, and supportive society; all children and youth have the same rights regardless of their culture, race, gender or gender identity, sexual orientation, religion, or disability; and all children and youth have the right to a better world than they inherited; and WHEREAS, The Peninsula Partnership Leadership Council has drafted the Peninsula Partnership Leadership Council Bill of Rights for the Children and Youth of San Mateo County to draw the attention of all county and local agencies, parents, guardians, and private enterprises, and to provide guidance in decisionmaking in order to address the needs and foster the healthy development of all children, youth, and families; and WHEREAS, The principles and goals of the Peninsula Partnership Leadership Council Bill of Rights for the Children and Youth of San Mateo County are equally applicable at the statewide level; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature supports a Bill of Rights for the Children and Youth of California that resolves to invest in all children and youth so that the following goals may be achieved: (1) They have healthy minds, bodies, and spirits that enable them to maximize their potential. (2) They each develop a healthy attachment to a parent, guardian, or caregiver, and an ongoing relationship with a caring and supportive adult. (3) Their essential needs are met, including, but not limited to, nutritious food, shelter, clothing, health care, and accessible transportation. (4) They have safe and healthy environments, including, but not limited to, homes, schools, neighborhoods, and communities. (5) They have access to a 21st century education that promotes success in life, in future careers, and a love of lifelong learning. (6) They have training in life skills that will prepare them to live independently, be self-sufficient, and contribute to their community. (7) They have employment opportunities with protections from unfair labor practices. (8) They have freedom from mistreatment, abuse, and neglect. (9) They have a voice in matters that affect them. (10) They have a sense of hope for their future; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature desires that every child and youth in this state should have the opportunities set forth in the Bill of Rights for the Children and Youth of California; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.