LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
HR14
Action History
CA
California House Bill HR14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California House Bill HR14
Action History
08/24/2009
Read and adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2705.).
08/20/2009
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 20).
07/15/2009
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
07/14/2009
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended.
04/20/2009
Referred to Com. on RULES.
04/15/2009
Introduced.