07/06/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/06/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
06/24/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |||
06/21/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/21/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5746.) To Senate. | |||
06/16/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/15/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |||
05/28/2010 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3519.) To Assembly. | |||
05/05/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3444.) | |||
04/26/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/20/2010 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
02/16/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |||
02/12/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |