LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1038
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1038
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1038
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 12, 2010
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
June 22, 2010
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
July 6, 2010
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 26, 2010
Compare
Bill
April 8, 2010
Compare