|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 6366.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (Heard in Committee on June 14.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3410.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3334.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (April 13 amended version corrected April 21.)
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3082.)
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|