LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1040
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1040
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1040
Compare Versions
SB1040 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB1040 Enrolled August 30, 2010
SB1040 Amended August 16, 2010
SB1040 Amended June 23, 2010
SB1040 Amended June 21, 2010
SB1040 Amended June 10, 2010
SB1040 Amended April 27, 2010
SB1040 Amended April 13, 2010
SB1040 Introduced February 12, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1040 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB1040 Enrolled August 30, 2010
SB1040 Amended August 16, 2010
SB1040 Amended June 23, 2010
SB1040 Amended June 21, 2010
SB1040 Amended June 10, 2010
SB1040 Amended April 27, 2010
SB1040 Amended April 13, 2010
SB1040 Introduced February 12, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare