|
09/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4643.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 6251.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3698.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3594.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3295.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|