LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1059
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1059
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1059
Compare Versions
SB1059 Enrolled August 23, 2010
SB1059 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1059 Amended May 28, 2010
SB1059 Amended May 19, 2010
SB1059 Amended May 6, 2010
SB1059 Amended April 5, 2010
SB1059 Introduced February 16, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1059 Enrolled August 23, 2010
SB1059 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1059 Amended May 28, 2010
SB1059 Amended May 19, 2010
SB1059 Amended May 6, 2010
SB1059 Amended April 5, 2010
SB1059 Introduced February 16, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare