|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2339.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Ordered returned to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly amendements were concurred in. Returned to Assembly for further action.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1923.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2616.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. (Heard in committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Corrected June 5.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 796.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 498.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|