LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB113
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB113
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB113
Compare Versions
SB113 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB113 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB113 Amended June 25, 2009
SB113 Amended June 17, 2009
SB113 Amended June 3, 2009
SB113 Amended April 2, 2009
SB113 Introduced January 29, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB113 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB113 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB113 Amended June 25, 2009
SB113 Amended June 17, 2009
SB113 Amended June 3, 2009
SB113 Amended April 2, 2009
SB113 Introduced January 29, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare