|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 3738.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3498.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3307.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 61(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3209.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (April 13 amended version corrected April 20.)
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|