LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1174
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1174
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1174
Compare Versions
SB1174 Amended June 24, 2010
SB1174 Amended June 21, 2010
SB1174 Amended April 29, 2010
SB1174 Amended April 27, 2010
SB1174 Amended April 13, 2010
SB1174 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1174 Amended June 24, 2010
SB1174 Amended June 21, 2010
SB1174 Amended April 29, 2010
SB1174 Amended April 27, 2010
SB1174 Amended April 13, 2010
SB1174 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare