|
08/23/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4408.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5930.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 0. Page 3478.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3183.)
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|