California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1191 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/10/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1191ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 9, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 1, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 20, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wiggins (Coauthor: Senator Hancock) FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to amend Section 52055.765 of the Education Code, relating to education funding. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1191, Wiggins. Education: minimum funding. Existing provisions of the California Constitution require the state to apply a minimum amount of funding for each fiscal year for the support of school districts and community college districts. Existing law provides that, for purposes of those minimum funding requirements for school districts and community college districts, appropriations for deficiencies and prior year adjustments are deemed appropriations in the fiscal year in which the deficiencies or prior year adjustments occurred, unless otherwise provided by law. Existing law, the Quality Education Investment Act of 2006, authorizes school districts and other local educational agencies to apply to the Superintendent of Public Instruction to receive funding to allocate to elementary and secondary schools and charter schools that are performing as specified, to improve academic instruction and pupil academic achievement. The department is required to perform, or contract with an independent evaluator to perform, various reports and evaluations, as specified, including a report to the Legislature and the Governor regarding a final evaluation. In that report, the department is required to make recommendations to continue, modify, or terminate the program by January 1, 2014, based upon the results in meeting the specified measurements. This bill would specify criteria for evaluating the effectiveness of pupil-counselor ratios in that report. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 52055.765 of the Education Code is amended to read: 52055.765. (a) The department shall perform, or contract with an independent evaluator to perform, all of the following: (1) Compose a progress report on or before January 1, 2010, and a second progress report on or before January 1, 2012, on the implementation of the program authorized under this article. (2) On or before January 1, 2014, conduct a final evaluation of the implementation of the program authorized under this article. (3) Provide a report to the Legislature and the Governor regarding the final evaluation completed under paragraph (2) and, in that report, make recommendations to continue, modify, or terminate the program by January 1, 2014, based upon the results in meeting the measurements described in subdivision (b). (b) The evaluation of the effectiveness of the program shall be based on effectiveness of strategies used by schools to implement the program and meet its accountability requirements pursuant to this article. When evaluating the effectiveness of the program, the department shall identify the strategies that demonstrate the effectiveness of schools in meeting accountability requirements pursuant to this article. When evaluating the effectiveness of pupil-counselor ratios, the department shall consider its impact on school and district dropout rates, performance on the high school exit examination adopted pursuant to Section 60850, the number of pupils graduating with a postsecondary education or career plan, and the Academic Performance Index of schools and districts. (c) The reports shall include pupil achievement data, disaggregated by subgroups, as required by the Academic Performance Index. (d) The department may use resources provided pursuant to subdivision (j) of Section 52055.770, or funds allocated in the annual Budget Act, for the purposes of carrying out the requirements of this section.