|
01/27/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Ma.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
From Conference Committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 8: Senators Steinberg, Pavley, Padilla, and Florez, Assembly Members Bass, Huffman, Caballero, and Solorio. Noes. 0. Page 2351.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Senate appoints Conference Committee: Senators Steinberg, Aanestad, Cogdill, Florez, Huff, Padilla, and Pavley. Assembly appoints Conference Committee: Assembly Members Bass, Caballero, Fuller, Huffman, Jeffries, Nielsen, and Solorio.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Joint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29.5 suspended in the Senate. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 2005.) Joint Rules 28, 28.1, 29, and 29.5 suspended in the Assembly. (Ayes 58. Noes 0. Page 2827.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 0. Noes 36. Page 1757.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 20. Page 2490.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 2433.) Placed on second reading file. Read second time. Amended. To third reading. (Ayes 41. Noes 25. Page 2440.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1194.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1066.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 703.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 478.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Coms. on N.R. & W. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|