LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB12
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB12
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB12
Compare Versions
SB12 Amended September 9, 2009
SB12 Amended July 9, 2009
SB12 Amended June 2, 2009
SB12 Amended May 5, 2009
SB12 Amended February 26, 2009
SB12 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
SB12 Amended September 9, 2009
SB12 Amended July 9, 2009
SB12 Amended June 2, 2009
SB12 Amended May 5, 2009
SB12 Amended February 26, 2009
SB12 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare