|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6668.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6426.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Returned to Assembly for further action.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69 (d) suspended. (Page 6303.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6305.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6242.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (June 16 amended measure version corrected June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3482.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3165.)
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|