California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1201 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill August 20, 2010
Bill August 16, 2010
Bill June 16, 2010
Bill April 20, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010