|
09/29/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4930.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 6676.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 7. Page 3652.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3498.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3306.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|