LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1230
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1230
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1230
Compare Versions
SB1230 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB1230 Amended August 16, 2010
SB1230 Amended April 21, 2010
SB1230 Amended April 7, 2010
SB1230 Amended March 24, 2010
SB1230 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1230 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB1230 Amended August 16, 2010
SB1230 Amended April 21, 2010
SB1230 Amended April 7, 2010
SB1230 Amended March 24, 2010
SB1230 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare