California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1230 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/16/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1230AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 7, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 24, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator DeSaulnier FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Part 12.5 (commencing with Section 2696) to Division 2 of the Labor Code, relating to human trafficking. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1230, as amended, DeSaulnier. Employment: posting requirements. Existing law requires employers to post various employment-related information for employees, including information relating to the payment of wages, workers' compensation, and discrimination in employment. This bill would require employers to post information related to slavery and human trafficking, including information related to  a   2  nonprofit  organization   organizations  that  provides   provide  services in support of the elimination of slavery and human trafficking. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Part 12.5 (commencing with Section 2696) is added to Division 2 of the Labor Code, to read: PART 12.5. HUMAN TRAFFICKING 2696. (a) An employer shall, as soon as practicable,  prepare and  post in a conspicuous location frequented by employees a notice in substantially the following form: ""Victims of slavery and human trafficking are protected under United States and California law. If you or someone you know is being forced to engage in any activity and cannot leave - whether it is commercial sex, housework, farm work, or any other activity - call the number  s  below to   access help and services: Call the National Human Trafficking Resource Center at 1-888-373-7888    or   the   California   Coalition to Abolish Slavery and Trafficking   (CAST) at 1-888-KEY-2-FRE(EDOM) or 1-888-539-2373.  The toll-free hotline  i  s  :   are:  b7 Available 24 hours a day, 7 days a week. b7 Operated by  a  nonprofit, nongovernmental organization  s  .   b7 Anonymous and confidential.  b7 Accessible in more than 160   b7 Accessible in 170  languages. b7 Able to provide help, referral to services, training, and general information. (b) The Labor Commissioner shall determine in what languages the notice required by subdivision (a) shall be  printed   provided and shall make the notice available on the Internet Web site of the Department of Industrial Relations or any other means the Labor Commissioner deems appropriate. The Labor Commissioner is not otherwise required to produce or distribute the notice.  2697. The Labor Commissioner shall enforce this part.