|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 703, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 4900.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6508.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 3. Page 3586.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3295.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (March 23 amended version corrected March 25.)
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|