BILL NUMBER: SB 1290CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 703 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 25, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 28, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 14, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 23, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Kehoe (Coauthor: Assembly Member Saldana) FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Section 51223.3 to the Education Code, relating to physical education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1290, Kehoe. Physical education: self-defense and safety instruction. Existing law requires that all pupils in grades 7 to 12, inclusive, except those excused or exempted pursuant to a prescribed provisions of law, attend physical education courses for a total period of time of not less than 400 minutes each 10 schooldays. Pursuant to its authority to issue program guidelines to serve as models or examples, the State Board of Education has adopted physical education model content standards for California public schools. This bill would require the State Board of Education and the Curriculum Development and Supplemental Materials Commission to include self-defense instruction, as defined, and safety instruction, as defined, in the next revision of the physical education framework for pupils in grades 7, 8, 9, 11, and 12. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51223.3 is added to the Education Code, to read: 51223.3. (a) During the next revision of the physical education framework, the state board and the Curriculum Development and Supplemental Materials Commission shall include self-defense instruction and safety instruction in that framework for pupils in grades 7, 8, 9, 11, and 12. (b) As used in this section: (1) "Safety instruction" includes, but is not necessarily limited to, awareness and avoidance of potentially dangerous situations. (2) "Self-defense instruction" includes, but is not necessarily limited to, martial arts, boxing, and other defensive techniques.