08/30/2010 | Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Romero. | |||
08/17/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
08/16/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 4519.) | |||
08/02/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (August 2 amended measure version corrected August 3.) | |||
07/08/2010 | Set for hearing July 15. | |||
06/28/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/24/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4076.) | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
06/08/2010 | Set for hearing June 23. | |||
05/10/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
04/29/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
04/22/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/20/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |