California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1316 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Amended

Bill August 17, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 28, 2010
Bill June 16, 2010
Bill April 22, 2010