|
08/04/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 3726.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3675.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3084.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|