California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1326 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 06/23/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1326AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 1, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 23, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Oropeza FEBRUARY 19, 2010  An act relating to the California Conservation Corps, and making an appropriation therefor.   An act to add Section 42872.3 to the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1326, as amended, Oropeza.  California Conservation Corps: local conservation corps.   Solid waste: tires.   The California Integrated Waste Management Act of 1989 requires the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery to administer a tire recycling program and authorizes the tire recycling program to include, among other things, the awarding of grants to public entities involved in activities and applications that result in reduced landfill disposal of used whole tires and reduced illegal disposal or stockpiling of used whole tires.   This bill would require a public entity that submits an application for a grant from the Local Government Waste Tire Cleanup and Amnesty Event Grant Program administered by the department to ask the local community conservation corps, as the bill would define that term, if it wishes to assist with cleanup or amnesty events in the event that the public entity receives a program grant. The public entity would be required to include with its application a statement that it has complied with that requirement and a statement of whether the local community conservation corps wishes to participate. If there is no local community conservation corps in the city in which cleanup or amnesty events will occur, the public entity would be required to include with its application a statement to that effect.   The Electronic Waste Recycling Act of 2003 requires a retailer selling a covered electronic device in this state to collect a covered electronic waste recycling fee from the consumer. Under existing law, the fees are deposited in the Electronic Waste Recovery and Recycling Account of the Integrated Waste Management Fund and are continuously appropriated for specified purposes.   This bill would appropriate $15,000,000 from that account to the California Conservation Corps for the purposes of making direct grants to certified local community conservation corps to collect and recycle covered electronic devices, as defined, consistent with the Electronic Waste Recycling Act of 2003, and for activities related to that collection and recycling. The bill would also appropriate $10,000,000 from that account to the California Conservation Corps to collect and recycle those covered electronic devices.  Vote: majority. Appropriation:  yes   no  . Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 42872.3 is added to the   Public Resources Code   , to read:   42872.3. (a) (1) Before a public entity submits an application for a grant from the Local Government Waste Tire Cleanup and Amnesty Event Grant Program administered by the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, the public entity shall ask the local community conservation corps if it wishes to assist with cleanup or amnesty events in the event that the public entity receives a grant from the program. (2) For purposes of paragraph (1), "local community conservation corps" means the community conservation corps, as defined in Section 14507.5, in the city in which cleanup or amnesty events will occur with grant funding if a grant is awarded to the applicant. (b) A public entity shall include with its application a statement that it has complied with subdivision (a) and a statement of whether the local community conservation corps wishes to participate. If there is no local community conservation corps in the city in which cleanup or amnesty events will occur, the public entity shall include with its application a statement to that effect.   SECTION 1.   (a) The Legislature hereby finds and declares that it is in the interest of the state and its citizens to create jobs and employment opportunities for unemployed youth performing environmental projects. (b) Notwithstanding Section 42476 of the Public Resources Code, the sum of ten million dollars ($10,000,000) is hereby appropriated from the Electronic Waste Recovery and Recycling Account in the Integrated Waste Management Fund to the California Conservation Corps for the purposes of collecting and recycling covered electronic devices, as defined in Section 42463 of the Public Resources Code, consistent with Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 42460) of Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, and for activities related to that collection and recycling. (c) Notwithstanding Section 42476 of the Public Resources Code, the sum of fifteen million dollars ($15,000,000) is hereby appropriated from the Electronic Waste Recovery and Recycling Account in the Integrated Waste Management Fund to the California Conservation Corps for the purposes of making direct grants to certified local community conservation corps to collect and recycle covered electronic devices, as defined in Section 42463 of the Public Resources Code, consistent with Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 42460) of Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, and for activities related to that collection and recycling. (d) Funds appropriated pursuant to subdivision (c) shall be used to provide immediate employment for at-risk youth and other persons who are members of local community conservation corps, so as to create new jobs, employ people in productive activities for fair wages, and reduce unemployment in the state.