|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5037.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6825.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 0. Page 3515.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading. Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3300.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|