LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1328
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1328
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1328
Compare Versions
SB1328 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB1328 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB1328 Amended June 16, 2010
SB1328 Amended May 6, 2010
SB1328 Amended April 12, 2010
SB1328 Amended March 25, 2010
SB1328 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1328 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB1328 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB1328 Amended June 16, 2010
SB1328 Amended May 6, 2010
SB1328 Amended April 12, 2010
SB1328 Amended March 25, 2010
SB1328 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare