|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 494, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4879.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 6235.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 6173.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5695.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 3650.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3445.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|